THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:34:50 AM
Klaassen, Robert John
CPSO#:
62471
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2210
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:16 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN KLAASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAASSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Paediatric Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1993 |