THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:57:05 PM
Karpinski, Jolanta Anna Maria
CPSO#:
62470
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82538
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOLANTA ANNA MARIA KARPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARPINSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1993 |