THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:24:39 PM
Hirshberg, Eric David
CPSO#:
62464
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 824-7272
Fax: (519) 824-0833
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:08 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC DAVID HIRSHBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSHBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |