THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:39:24 PM
Huang, Madeline Wan Cheng
CPSO#:
62462
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 499-3559
Fax: (416) 499-4631
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MADELINE WAN CHENG HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1991 |