THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:40:41 PM
Amdemichael, Esiahas
CPSO#:
62458
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ESIAHAS AMDEMICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMDEMICHAEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1991 |