THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:09:55 AM
Turek, Caroline Anne
CPSO#:
62448
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Francey, Caroline Anne (used until: 18 Jul 1991 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 Kingston Rd W
Centre for Restorative Medicine
Ajax ON L1T 3A3
Phone: (289) 660-2761
Fax: (289) 660-2763
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANNE TUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUREK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 16 Dec 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2024 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 16 Feb 2024 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 15 Dec 2023
Summary:
On December 15, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Turek engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to her communications on her publicly available social media accounts and other online forums regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. Dr. Turek’s online communications included:- Inappropriate criticism of public health and government policies regarding COVID-19 that promoted prolonged lockdowns, masking, and vaccine mandates;
- Promotion of Ivermectin/Hydroxychloroquine to treat COVID-19, contrary to public health recommendations;
- Inappropriate criticism of the College due to its stances in support of public health recommendations around COVID-19 issues; and
- Assertions that COVID-19 vaccines are unsafe and opposing vaccine mandates.
The Tribunal ordered that:
- Dr. Turek attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Turek’s certificate of registration for two months commencing December 16, 2023 at 12:01 a.m.;
- Dr. Turek pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 15, 2024.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand: 2023-12-15