THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:08:31 PM
Forbes, Thomas Lawrence
CPSO#:
62430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton North 6 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3274
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:11 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS LAWRENCE FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1991 |