THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:47:42 AM
Ali, Pervez Syed
CPSO#:
62414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York ON M3B 1T1
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PERVEZ SYED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1991 |