THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:21:15 AM
Dua, Vikram
CPSO#:
62405
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Place Centre
2 Surrey Place
Toronto ON M5S 2C2
Phone: (416) 925-5141
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKRAM DUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2015 |