THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:33:28 PM
Bahra, Parminder Singh
CPSO#:
62384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Colborne St Clinic
347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 2N2
Phone: (519) 754-2893
Fax: (519) 758-0182
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARMINDER SINGH BAHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1991 |