THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:53:50 PM
Friedman, Steven Marc
CPSO#:
62378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
RFE G-S434
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN MARC FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1991 |