THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:16:47 PM
Midroni, Gyl
CPSO#:
62364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Neurophysiology
Donnelly wing, Rm 9-502
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5193
Fax: (416) 864-6095
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:21 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GYL MIDRONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDRONI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1991 |