THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:52:46 AM
Maharajh, Gyaandeo Seusaran
CPSO#:
62312
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Cardiovascular Surgery
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3256
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GYAANDEO SEUSARAN MAHARAJH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2000 |