THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:52:37 PM
Marmor, Eric
CPSO#:
62298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Queensway West
Suite 602
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 905-270-1104
Fax: 905-270-0569
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:10 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC MARMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1992 |