THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:00:50 AM
Bhimji, Khadija
CPSO#:
62286
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Palliative Care Program
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHADIJA BHIMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2003 to 13 Jan 2004
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1991 |