THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:25:45 PM
Petrella, Robert John
CPSO#:
62275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Suite 2102
London ON N6G 2M1
Phone: (519) 661-2111 Ext. 22119
Fax: (519) 858-5167
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN PETRELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRELLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1991 |