THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:23:21 AM
Joyce, Joan Elizabeth
CPSO#:
62274
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joyce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:111 Probandt St
Unit 415
San Antonio, Texas
78204
United States
Date Received: 28 Jun 2020
Instructions/Address:
707 Charlotte Street, Peterborough, ON K9J 7B3
Date Received: 05 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 18 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |