THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:44:41 PM
Slinger, Robert William
CPSO#:
62264
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
Canadian Medical Protective Associa
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 6138530765
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Slinger-Morson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa K1H 8L1
Date Received: 05 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM SLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLINGER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 1996 to 30 Aug 1996
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2021 |