THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:12:38 PM
Gotesman, Galina l
CPSO#:
62249
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M3H 3S3
Phone: 416-226-5510
Fax: 416-226-5545
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GALINA L GOTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTESMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1991 |