THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:10:09 PM
Ostrowski, John Dennis
CPSO#:
62238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-5400 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Phone: 905-356-8333
Fax: 905-356-1702
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:13 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DENNIS OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1991 |