THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:43:44 PM
Bauermeister, Senta Ute Frauke
CPSO#:
62230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
113-398 Van Buren St
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Fax: (613)-258-7808
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SENTA UTE FRAUKE BAUERMEISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUERMEISTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2018 |