THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:33:59 PM
Green, Douglas Stephen
CPSO#:
62223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS STEPHEN GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1992 |