THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:52:21 PM
Webster, James
CPSO#:
62215
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough ON K9J 7H8
Phone: 705-876-1066
Fax: 705-876-8763
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 1991 |