THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:47:05 AM
Ingram, Alistair John
CPSO#:
62209
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISTAIR JOHN INGRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGRAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1991 |