THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:15:08 PM
Van Vlymen, Janet Miriam
CPSO#:
62179
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANET MIRIAM VAN VLYMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN VLYMEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1991 |