THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:31:14 AM
Johnston, Shawna Lee
CPSO#:
62173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6115
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWNA LEE JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1993 |