THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:01:50 PM
Cornell, Richard Anthony
CPSO#:
62154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON L9Y 4T3
Phone: (705) 445-0458
Fax: 705-445-2586
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANTHONY CORNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNELL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1991 |