THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:45:24 PM
Cranstoun, Kelly Rae
CPSO#:
62135
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
6S-184
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6183
Fax: (416) 756-6066
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KELLY RAE CRANSTOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANSTOUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1991 |