THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:51:51 AM
Iliescu, Eduard Andrei
CPSO#:
62119
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr Wing 3
Suite 3.041
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 1360
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDUARD ANDREI ILIESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILIESCU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1991 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDING OF GUILT
Eduard Iliescu was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code; and
2. Failing to stop at accident scene, contrary to Section 252(1.1) of the Criminal Code.
DATE: September 19, 2018
SENTENCE: 3 months’ imprisonment to be served in the community, followed by 9 months’ probation; 12 month driving prohibition.
Download Full Document (PDF)