THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:55:53 PM
Forster-Gibson, Cynthia Jane
CPSO#:
62113
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
25 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Forster-Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Trillium Health Partners, Health Information Management, 100 Queensway West, Mississauga, Ontario L5B 1B8
Date Received: 25 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Sep 1996
CF - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Sep 1997
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jan 2021 |