THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:37:56 PM
Forestell, Gerald Patrick
CPSO#:
62093
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 May 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gerald Forestell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:08 Dec 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerald Patrick Forestell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 10, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Forestell engaged in sexual abuse of patients in his family medicine practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Forestell resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)