THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:23:32 PM
Clendenning, Robert Douglas
CPSO#:
62090
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Clendenning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Ontario Document Storage (ODS)
PO Box 2071
Sudbury , Ontario
P3A 4R8
Phone: (705) 560-8461
Fax: (705) 524-8012
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 05 Aug 2010
Instructions/Address:Ontario Document Storage (ODS)
PO Box 2071
Sudbury , Ontario
P3A 4R8
Phone: (705) 560-8461
Fax: (705) 524-8012
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Jan 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Douglas Clendenning to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 22, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Clendenning engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Clendenning will engage in professional education in the prescribing of opioids.