THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:27:03 PM
Cameron, Brian Howard
CPSO#:
62065
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brian Howard Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:25 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |