THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:23:14 AM
Hynes, Mark Stephen
CPSO#:
62015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 May 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 May 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiac Anaesthesia
Room H2410
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7099
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK STEPHEN HYNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYNES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 1994 to 28 Feb 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1996 to 30 Apr 1996
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1996 |