THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:48:13 PM
Flageole, Helene
CPSO#:
62007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric Surgery
1200 Main Street West
suite 4E8
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75244
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HELENE FLAGEOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAGEOLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |