THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:59:20 PM
Gawlik, Janusz Donat
CPSO#:
62005
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical Record requests should be directed to Dr. J. Gawlik via the following methods:
E-mail: [email protected] or phone number: 613-286-4160
Date Received: 20 Mar 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Mar 2024 |