THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:37:11 PM
Goossen, Christine Marie
CPSO#:
61931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6578
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE GOOSSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOSSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1990 |