THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:51:41 PM
Wynne, Linda Ann
CPSO#:
61930
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
08 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Feb 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
8-Jan-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L. Wynne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1990 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 08 Jan 2019 |