THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:12:32 AM
Braidek, Catherine Mary
CPSO#:
61919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Geriatric Psychiatry
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6851
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Braidek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY BRAIDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDEK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1991 |