THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:27:12 PM
Johnson, Ross William
CPSO#:
61915
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R.W. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 17 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1990 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2001 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 10 Aug 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2022 |