THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:22:53 PM
Ayanbadejo, Benjamin Olasimbo
CPSO#:
61882
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin O. Ayanbadejo, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 27 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hospital Practice :
North Wellington Health Care Authority/ Louise Marshall Hospital Mount Forest
630,Dublin St,Mount Forest,ON N0G 2L3
4-39 Kay Cres. Guelph, ON
N1L 0N5
ONT
Date Received: 12 May 2022
Instructions/Address:Previous patients of Dr. Ayanbadejo can call 519-323-2210 to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 09 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:17 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |