THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:51:52 PM
Minhas, Kuldip Singh
CPSO#:
61872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Kerala, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 502-9900
Fax: (416) 502-9905
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KULDIP SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1997 |