THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:56:54 AM
Navaneelan, Gnanapragasam Christy
CPSO#:
61870
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
25 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Feb-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Ceylon, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: G.C. Navaneelan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 19 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1992 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 25 Feb 2021 |