THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:36:17 PM
Abouelnasr, Wahid Aly
CPSO#:
61865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1896 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 2L8
Phone: 416 778 1496
Fax: 416 778 1400
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAHID ALY ABOUELNASR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUELNASR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Neurosurgery
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1996 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 2006
Summary:
On November 8, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Wahid Aly Abouelnasr committed professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Abouelnasr(s certificate of registration for six months commencing December 1, 2006.
2. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Abouelnasr to pay to the College costs in the amount of $1,250.
3. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 2006