THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:17:08 AM
Hoe, Walter
CPSO#:
61769
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ho, Walter I Chie (used until: 26 Apr 2001 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CF H Svcs
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1060
Fax: (613) 945-1070
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WALTER HOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2003 to 13 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2004 to 13 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2005 to 10 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2006 to 10 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1989 |