THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:36:41 AM
Desai, Hiren Bhupendra
CPSO#:
61743
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Oct 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue
Suite 259
Windsor ON N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 254-4424
Fax: (519) 254-4194
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:29 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HIREN BHUPENDRA DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1991 |