THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:26:10 AM
Ponich, Terry Peter
CPSO#:
61738
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6 323A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6878
Fax: (519) 667-6820
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRY PETER PONICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 1989 |