THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:21:02 AM
Jordan, Edward Henry
CPSO#:
61732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 Water Lane
Box 10
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3M6
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2000 to 15 Sep 2000
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 May 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 16 May 2011 |
|
Active |