THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:16:44 AM
Paramsothy, Rasiah
CPSO#:
61715
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Ceylon, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dixon Medical Centre
Suite 402
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 836-6733
Fax: (905) 836-5581
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R. Paramsothy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RASIAH PARAMSOTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMSOTHY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2022 |