THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:51:59 PM
Park, Joonseong
CPSO#:
61690
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Manitoba, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Medical Centre
801 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON L4Y 4G9
Phone: (905) 566-1501
Fax: (905) 566-1895
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOONSEONG PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Jan 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2023 |